Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Personal Representatives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256
Title
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507 /CH0365 (SB0239/CH0364)
Title
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524
Title
Foreclosure - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property and Registration Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0644 (SB0691)
Title
Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 (SB0801)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887 /CH0563
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Representation
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 /CH0396 (SB0509/CH0395)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 (SB0930)
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152
Title
Public Health - Final Disposition of Unclaimed Bodies - Authorizing Agent (Nancy's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 (SB0913)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1336
Title
Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of Delivery
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0364 (HB0507/CH0365)
Title
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0395 (HB0920/CH0396)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0644)
Title
Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 (HB0796)
Title
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 (HB1229)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981
Title
Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - Fees
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0256 Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0507 /CH0365 (SB0239/CH0364) Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0524 Foreclosure - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property and Registration Requirement Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0644 (SB0691) Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act) Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0796 (SB0801) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0887 /CH0563 Maryland Trust Act - Representation Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0920 /CH0396 (SB0509/CH0395) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0947 (SB0930) Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1152 Public Health - Final Disposition of Unclaimed Bodies - Authorizing Agent (Nancy's Law) Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 (SB0913) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1336 Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of Delivery Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0239 /CH0364 (HB0507/CH0365) Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 /CH0395 (HB0920/CH0396) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 (HB0644) Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act) Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 (HB0796) Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0913 (HB1229) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0981 Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - Fees Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM