Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pharmacy Benefits Managers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0544
Title
Pharmacy Benefits - Processing and Adjudication of Claims - Restrictions on Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 /CH0534
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Audit and Professional Dispensing Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0751 /CH0549
Title
Health Insurance - Prior Authorization - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754 /CH0400
Title
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Cost Pricing and Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759 /CH0550
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759)
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324 (SB1039)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759 (HB0768/CH0692)
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1324)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0544 Pharmacy Benefits - Processing and Adjudication of Claims - Restrictions on Fees Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0589 /CH0534 Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Audit and Professional Dispensing Fees Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0751 /CH0549 Health Insurance - Prior Authorization - Requirements Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0754 /CH0400 Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Cost Pricing and Reimbursement Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0759 /CH0550 Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759) Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 (SB1039) Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0759 (HB0768/CH0692) Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1324) Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM