Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Photography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579
Title
Crimes - Extortion of Sexual Images
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620
Title
Crimes - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Unauthorized Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0453
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - "Mug Shot" Web Sites
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0618 /CH0184
Title
Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Required Records - Photograph of Precious Metal Object
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0579 Crimes - Extortion of Sexual Images Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0620 Crimes - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Unauthorized Surveillance Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 /CH0453 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - "Mug Shot" Web Sites Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0618 /CH0184 Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Required Records - Photograph of Precious Metal Object Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/11 at 9:45 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/11/2015 - 9:45 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page