Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Physician Assistants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0569
Title
Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician Assistant
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0591 /CH0442 (SB0549/CH0443)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1299
Title
Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0549 /CH0443 (HB0591/CH0442)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0569 Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician Assistant Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0591 /CH0442 (SB0549/CH0443) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement Delegate Platt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1299 Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature Requirement Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB0549 /CH0443 (HB0591/CH0442) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM
Click to return on the top page