Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Physical Therapists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179 /CH0074 (SB0048)
Title
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Failure to Pass Licensure Examination - Prohibition on Issuance of License
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201 /CH0076
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979 (SB0580)
Title
State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners and State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Dry Needling - Registration Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0048 (HB0179/CH0074)
Title
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Failure to Pass Licensure Examination - Prohibition on Issuance of License
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 (HB0979)
Title
State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners and State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Dry Needling - Registration Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0179 /CH0074 (SB0048) State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Failure to Pass Licensure Examination - Prohibition on Issuance of License Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0201 /CH0076 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0979 (SB0580) State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners and State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Dry Needling - Registration Requirements Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0048 (HB0179/CH0074) State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Failure to Pass Licensure Examination - Prohibition on Issuance of License Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0124 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists Senator Gladden 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0580 (HB0979) State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners and State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Dry Needling - Registration Requirements Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM