Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Physical Therapists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0648 /CH0374 (SB0652)
Title
Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 /CH0761
Title
State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Massage Therapists - Authority to Regulate
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 (HB0648/CH0374)
Title
Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0648 /CH0374 (SB0652) Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
SB0554 /CH0761 State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Massage Therapists - Authority to Regulate Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0652 (HB0648/CH0374) Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact Senator Young 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM