Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Places of Worship -see also- Religion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Chaplains
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057 (SB0556)
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 (SB0096/CH0320)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 /CH0135
Title
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Eligible Borrowers
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292 /CH0620 (SB0338/CH0621)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 /CH0540 (SB0158)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Nonpublic Schools - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769
Title
Harford County Parishioner Protection Pilot Program
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 (SB1007)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Church or Religious Organization Property (Parishioner Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0320 (HB0161)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158 (HB0332/CH0540)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 /CH0621 (HB0292/CH0620)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 (HB0057)
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1007 (HB0781)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Church or Religious Organization Property (Parishioner Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0029 Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Chaplains Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0057 (SB0556) State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0161 (SB0096/CH0320) Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019) Delegate Mosby 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0170 /CH0135 Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Eligible Borrowers Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0292 /CH0620 (SB0338/CH0621) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0332 /CH0540 (SB0158) Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0356 Primary and Secondary Education - Nonpublic Schools - Required Information Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0769 Harford County Parishioner Protection Pilot Program Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB0781 (SB1007) Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Church or Religious Organization Property (Parishioner Protection Act of 2019) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
SB0096 /CH0320 (HB0161) Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019) Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0158 (HB0332/CH0540) Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0338 /CH0621 (HB0292/CH0620) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0556 (HB0057) State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1007 (HB0781) Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Church or Religious Organization Property (Parishioner Protection Act of 2019) Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM