Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Planning, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0394
Title
Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 (SB0601/CH0371)
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 (SB0256)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0881)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0371 (HB0130)
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0394 Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0130 (SB0601/CH0371) African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions Delegate Jones 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0881 (SB0256) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 (HB0881) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Senator Pinsky 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0601 /CH0371 (HB0130) African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM