Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Planning, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131
Title
State Planning - Central Depository
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0417 /CH0366 (SB0314/CH0367)
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512
Title
The James Samuel Coleman Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1438 (SB0896)
Title
Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1449
Title
Baltimore City - Modifying or Closing Public School Facility - Review by Community Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0406
Title
Program Open Space - Attainment of Acquisition Goals - Local Government Apportionment and Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0896 (HB1438)
Title
Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0131 State Planning - Central Depository Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0417 /CH0366 (SB0314/CH0367) Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0512 The James Samuel Coleman Act of 2017 Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1438 (SB0896) Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1449 Baltimore City - Modifying or Closing Public School Facility - Review by Community Task Force Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0406 Program Open Space - Attainment of Acquisition Goals - Local Government Apportionment and Use of Funds Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0896 (HB1438) Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM