Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Plastics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209 (SB0313)
Title
Plastic Bag Reduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354
Title
Solid Waste Management - Personal Cleansing Products Provided at Lodging Establishments - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1098
Title
Use of Public Funds – Playground and Athletic Field Surfaces – Authorizations, Preferences, and Prohibitions (Safe and Healthy Fields Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1442 /CH0471 (SB0840/CH0472)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1547
Title
Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Producer Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0313 (HB0209)
Title
Plastics and Packaging Reduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 /CH0472 (HB1442/CH0471)
Title
Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0209 (SB0313) Plastic Bag Reduction Act Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Finance
HB0354 Solid Waste Management - Personal Cleansing Products Provided at Lodging Establishments - Prohibition Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1098 Use of Public Funds – Playground and Athletic Field Surfaces – Authorizations, Preferences, and Prohibitions (Safe and Healthy Fields Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1442 /CH0471 (SB0840/CH0472) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Definition Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 471
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1547 Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Producer Responsibility Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0313 (HB0209) Plastics and Packaging Reduction Act Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0840 /CH0472 (HB1442/CH0471) Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Definition Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 472
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 11:19 AM