Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pleas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929
Title
Criminal Procedure - Plea Agreements - Crime of Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0034 (SB0767/CH0033)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Maryland Judiciary Case Search - Notation of Plea Agreement
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575
Title
Criminal Procedure - Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 /CH0033 (HB1096/CH0034)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0929 Criminal Procedure - Plea Agreements - Crime of Violence Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0034 (SB0767/CH0033) Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1312 Clerks of the Courts - Maryland Judiciary Case Search - Notation of Plea Agreement Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0575 Criminal Procedure - Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0767 /CH0033 (HB1096/CH0034) Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM