Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Plumbing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539 /CH0368
Title
Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 /CH0557 (SB0481)
Title
Drinking Water Outlets in School Buildings – Lead Testing and Reporting Requirements and Grant Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund - Elevator Safety Review Board
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0539 /CH0368 Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1253 /CH0557 (SB0481) Drinking Water Outlets in School Buildings – Lead Testing and Reporting Requirements and Grant Programs Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0021 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund - Elevator Safety Review Board Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (22-25)
Finance
1/24/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM