Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Podiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 /CH0437 (SB0198)
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716 /CH0269 (SB0347)
Title
Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 (HB0580/CH0437)
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 (HB0716/CH0269)
Title
Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0547 Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0580 /CH0437 (SB0198) Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0716 /CH0269 (SB0347) Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0198 (HB0580/CH0437) Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0347 (HB0716/CH0269) Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts Senator Pugh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM