Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Podiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696 (SB0430)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430 (HB0696)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0696 (SB0430) Maryland Health Care Commission - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1252 Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0430 (HB0696) Maryland Health Care Commission - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM