Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Police Training Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060
Title
Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294 /CH0221 (SB0542)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements (Christopher's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425
Title
Public Safety - Loyola University and The Johns Hopkins University Police Forces
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0608 (SB0819)
Title
Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and Awareness
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 /CH0613
Title
State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 /CH0491 (SB0652)
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350 /CH0490
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0542 (HB0294/CH0221)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements (Christopher's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 (HB0929/CH0491)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Jurisdictions
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819 (HB0608)
Title
Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and Awareness
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0860 /CH0201
Title
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0060 Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013 Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0294 /CH0221 (SB0542) Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements (Christopher's Law) Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0425 Public Safety - Loyola University and The Johns Hopkins University Police Forces Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0608 (SB0819) Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and Awareness Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0765 /CH0613 State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 /CH0491 (SB0652) Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014 Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0350 /CH0490 Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014 Senator Brochin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Reporting Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0542 (HB0294/CH0221) Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements (Christopher's Law) Senator Muse 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 (HB0929/CH0491) Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Jurisdictions Senator Robey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0819 (HB0608) Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and Awareness Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0860 /CH0201 Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - Procedures Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM