Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Police Training Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0173)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339 (SB0413/CH0127)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 (SB0528)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 /CH0129 (SB0628)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0890
Title
State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918 (SB0727)
Title
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1237 /CH0305
Title
Police and Correctional Training Commissions - Applicants - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0338)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0413 /CH0127 (HB0339)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482 /CH0128 (HB0627)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 (HB0360)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0727 (HB0918)
Title
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0338 (SB0173) Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0339 (SB0413/CH0127) Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements Delegate Carter 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0360 (SB0528) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (87-51)
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0533 /CH0129 (SB0628) Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0890 State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - Required Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0918 (SB0727) Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1237 /CH0305 Police and Correctional Training Commissions - Applicants - Criminal History Records Checks Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0173 (HB0338) Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0413 /CH0127 (HB0339) Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0482 /CH0128 (HB0627) Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 (HB0360) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Senator Raskin 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2016
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0727 (HB0918) Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM