Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Candidates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053
Title
Election Law - Private Loan to Campaign Finance Entity of Candidate - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Elections - Ballots - Random Ordering of Names
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173
Title
Montgomery County - Ranked Choice Voting MC 19-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332
Title
Election Law - Use of Campaign Material Purchased Under the Authority of a Prior Treasurer
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630 /CH0273 (SB0289/CH0272)
Title
Frederick County – Ethics and Campaign Activity – Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 (SB0256)
Title
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768
Title
Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785
Title
Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 /CH0834 (SB0875/CH0833)
Title
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330
Title
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest - Political Consulting
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1576
Title
Elections - Heads of State Governmental Units - Prohibition on Candidacy for Public Office
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1035)
Title
Declaration of Rights – Access to Information
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1703
Title
Election Law - Failure to File Campaign Finance Report or Affidavit - Injunctive Relief
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1805
Title
Election Law - Fund-Raising and Donations in Connection With a Campaign - Prohibition on Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244
Title
Campaign Material – Social Media – Consent for Use of Image
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Hatch Act
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0662)
Title
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289 /CH0272 (HB0630/CH0273)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 /CH0644
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 /CH0833 (HB0981/CH0834)
Title
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1035 (HB1648)
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right to Information
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0053 Election Law - Private Loan to Campaign Finance Entity of Candidate - Prohibited Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0063 Elections - Ballots - Random Ordering of Names Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0173 Montgomery County - Ranked Choice Voting MC 19-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0332 Election Law - Use of Campaign Material Purchased Under the Authority of a Prior Treasurer Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0537 Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0630 /CH0273 (SB0289/CH0272) Frederick County – Ethics and Campaign Activity – Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0662 (SB0256) Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - Disclosure Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0785 Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0981 /CH0834 (SB0875/CH0833) Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1330 Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest - Political Consulting Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1576 Elections - Heads of State Governmental Units - Prohibition on Candidacy for Public Office Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1648 (SB1035) Declaration of Rights – Access to Information Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1703 Election Law - Failure to File Campaign Finance Report or Affidavit - Injunctive Relief Delegate West 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1805 Election Law - Fund-Raising and Donations in Connection With a Campaign - Prohibition on Firearms Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0130 Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0244 Campaign Material – Social Media – Consent for Use of Image Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0246 State Personnel - Maryland Hatch Act Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 (HB0662) Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0289 /CH0272 (HB0630/CH0273) Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0374 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 /CH0644 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0875 /CH0833 (HB0981/CH0834) Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1035 (HB1648) Declaration of Rights - Right to Information Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM