Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Political Committees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 (SB0667)
Title
Real-Time Transparency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294
Title
Election Law - Contributions - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Membership PG 315-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Election Law - Audits of Election Results
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Between Candidates and Outside Spending Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0667 (HB0185)
Title
Real-Time Transparency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0380
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823
Title
Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance Entity
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836
Title
General Assembly - Name Submitted by Central Committee to Fill Vacancy - Required Appointment by Governor
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0185 (SB0667) Real-Time Transparency Act of 2015 Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0294 Election Law - Contributions - Disclosure Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Membership PG 315-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1064 Election Law - Audits of Election Results Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1088 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Between Candidates and Outside Spending Organizations Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0667 (HB0185) Real-Time Transparency Act of 2015 Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 /CH0380 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0823 Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance Entity Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0836 General Assembly - Name Submitted by Central Committee to Fill Vacancy - Required Appointment by Governor Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page