Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Committees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0260
Title
Campaign Finance - Disclosure of Contributions and Expenditures - Preelection Period
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383
Title
Campaign Finance Entities - Solicitation Disclosures - Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630 /CH0273 (SB0289/CH0272)
Title
Frederick County – Ethics and Campaign Activity – Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768
Title
Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 /CH0834 (SB0875/CH0833)
Title
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289 /CH0272 (HB0630/CH0273)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0426
Title
Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance Entity
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 /CH0833 (HB0981/CH0834)
Title
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0260 Campaign Finance - Disclosure of Contributions and Expenditures - Preelection Period Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0383 Campaign Finance Entities - Solicitation Disclosures - Expenditures Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0630 /CH0273 (SB0289/CH0272) Frederick County – Ethics and Campaign Activity – Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0768 Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - Disclosure Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0981 /CH0834 (SB0875/CH0833) Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0289 /CH0272 (HB0630/CH0273) Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0426 Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance Entity Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0875 /CH0833 (HB0981/CH0834) Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM