Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Parties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515 (SB0327)
Title
Elections for Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Restrictions on Commissioners from Montgomery County MC/PG 102-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1044 (SB0584)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323
Title
State Government - State Boards and Commissions - Minority Party Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 /CH0691
Title
Election Law - Baltimore County Democratic Party Central Committee - Membership
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1531 /CH0692
Title
Election Law - Prince George's County Republican Party Central Committee - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0294
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Elections
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0327 (HB0515)
Title
Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Courts - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0453
Title
Election Law and Ethics - Political Parties - Uniform Transparency, Disclosure, and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0584 (HB1044)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0515 (SB0327) Elections for Judges - Nonpartisan Elections Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0635 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Restrictions on Commissioners from Montgomery County MC/PG 102-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1044 (SB0584) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1323 State Government - State Boards and Commissions - Minority Party Representation Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1524 /CH0691 Election Law - Baltimore County Democratic Party Central Committee - Membership Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 691
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1531 /CH0692 Election Law - Prince George's County Republican Party Central Committee - Membership Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0294 Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Elections Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0327 (HB0515) Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Courts - Nonpartisan Elections Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0453 Election Law and Ethics - Political Parties - Uniform Transparency, Disclosure, and Accountability Act Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0584 (HB1044) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM