Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Parties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072
Title
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087 (SB0156)
Title
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 /CH0107
Title
Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and Procedures
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0129)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303 (SB0854)
Title
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 /CH0786
Title
Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707
Title
Election Law - Political Party - Retention of Status
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0879 /CH0031 (SB0683)
Title
Public Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0898 /CH0852
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Election Law - Court Offices - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160
Title
Baltimore County - Judges - Nonpartisan Elections (Baltimore County Voting Rights Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1498 /CH0851
Title
Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Compliance and Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058
Title
Election Law - Election Observers
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064
Title
Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129 (HB0210)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156 (HB0087)
Title
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB0879/CH0031)
Title
Public Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 (HB0303)
Title
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0087 (SB0156) Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0143 /CH0107 Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and Procedures Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0210 (SB0129) Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0303 (SB0854) Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0529 /CH0786 Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 786
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0622 Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0707 Election Law - Political Party - Retention of Status Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0879 /CH0031 (SB0683) Public Integrity Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0898 /CH0852 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 Legislative and Congressional Districting Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1056 Election Law - Court Offices - Nonpartisan Elections Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1160 Baltimore County - Judges - Nonpartisan Elections (Baltimore County Voting Rights Act) Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1498 /CH0851 Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Compliance and Disclosure Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 Election Law - Election Observers Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 PM
SB0064 Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 PM
SB0129 (HB0210) Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0156 (HB0087) Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 (HB0879/CH0031) Public Integrity Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0744 Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0832 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 (HB0303) Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process Senator Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-45)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM