Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Parties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280 (SB1061)
Title
Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770
Title
Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as Predecessor
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1444
Title
Election Law - Primary Elections - Voters Not Affiliated With a Political Party
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1717 /CH0552
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Voter Registration Numbers
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1725
Title
Election Law - Simultaneous Candidacy for Party and Public Office
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190
Title
Election Law - International Election Observers
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Hatch Act
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0662)
Title
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940
Title
Election Law - Polling Places - Election Judges
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061 (HB0280)
Title
Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0280 (SB1061) Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0477 Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0770 Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as Predecessor Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1444 Election Law - Primary Elections - Voters Not Affiliated With a Political Party Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1717 /CH0552 State Government - Protection of Information - Voter Registration Numbers Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1725 Election Law - Simultaneous Candidacy for Party and Public Office Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0130 Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0190 Election Law - International Election Observers Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0246 State Personnel - Maryland Hatch Act Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 (HB0662) Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0374 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 Election Law - Polling Places - Election Judges Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1061 (HB0280) Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM