Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pollution -see also- Sediment Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011 /CH0697
Title
Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281 (SB0266)
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384 /CH0369 (SB0343/CH0368)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0845
Title
Education - Public School Indoor Air Quality
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1282
Title
Public Service Commission - Out-of-State Carbon Pollution Program - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158 /CH0390
Title
Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 (HB0281)
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277
Title
Motor Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 /CH0368 (HB0384/CH0369)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 /CH0363
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773
Title
Community Healthy Air Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Nonprofit Campgrounds
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 /CH0697 Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - Prohibition Delegate Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0281 (SB0266) Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Prohibition Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0384 /CH0369 (SB0343/CH0368) Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0845 Education - Public School Indoor Air Quality Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1282 Public Service Commission - Out-of-State Carbon Pollution Program - Study Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0158 /CH0390 Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0266 (HB0281) Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0277 Motor Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0343 /CH0368 (HB0384/CH0369) Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0393 /CH0363 Clean Cars Act of 2017 Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0773 Community Healthy Air Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0776 Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Nonprofit Campgrounds Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM