Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pornography -see also- Nudity and Sexual Displays; Obscenity

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181 /CH0027 (SB0103/CH0026)
Title
Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0691
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1027 /CH0325 (SB0736/CH0326)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1049
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Child Pornography - Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
Exposure to Pornography - Public Health Crisis
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 /CH0026 (HB0181/CH0027)
Title
Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 /CH0326 (HB1027/CH0325)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0181 /CH0027 (SB0103/CH0026) Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0) Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0691 Criminal Law - Child Pornography Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1027 /CH0325 (SB0736/CH0326) Criminal Law - Child Pornography Delegate Lopez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1049 Criminal Law - Distribution of Child Pornography - Minor Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HJ0004 Exposure to Pornography - Public Health Crisis Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0103 /CH0026 (HB0181/CH0027) Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0) Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0736 /CH0326 (HB1027/CH0325) Criminal Law - Child Pornography Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 9:00 AM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM