Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Power Plants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0731
Title
Generating Stations - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consideration of Water Usage
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747 (SB0734)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861 (SB0259/CH0287)
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168
Title
Electricity - Certificate - Wind Turbines - Limitation
Sponsor
Southern Maryland Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463 (SB1020)
Title
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0287 (HB0861)
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 (HB0747)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020 (HB1463)
Title
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0731 Generating Stations - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consideration of Water Usage Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0747 (SB0734) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0861 (SB0259/CH0287) Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1168 Electricity - Certificate - Wind Turbines - Limitation Southern Maryland Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Economic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1463 (SB1020) Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0259 /CH0287 (HB0861) Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Environmental Matters
SB0734 (HB0747) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1020 (HB1463) Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM