Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pregnancy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009 /CH0393 (SB0105)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0273)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0173)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 (SB0431)
Title
Public Health - Dental Services for Adults - Coverage and Access
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0437
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Maryland Teenage Pregnancy Prevention Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0492
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 (SB0585)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 (SB0074/CH0006)
Title
Task Force to Study Maternal Mental Health
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 /CH0483 (SB0416/CH0482)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961 (SB0511)
Title
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074 /CH0006 (HB0739)
Title
Task Force to Study Maternal Mental Health
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 (HB0009/CH0393)
Title
Maryland Home Birth Safety Act
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158
Title
Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound Options
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0338)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 /CH0329
Title
Workgroup to Study Access to Obstetric Services
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 (HB0220)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 /CH0482 (HB0838/CH0483)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431 (HB0355)
Title
Public Health - Dental Services for Adults - Coverage and Access
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 (HB0961)
Title
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 /CH0363
Title
Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 (HB0553)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0009 /CH0393 (SB0105) Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0220 (SB0273) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0338 (SB0173) Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0355 (SB0431) Public Health - Dental Services for Adults - Coverage and Access Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0437 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Maryland Teenage Pregnancy Prevention Grant Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0492 Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0553 (SB0585) Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0739 (SB0074/CH0006) Task Force to Study Maternal Mental Health Delegate Kelly 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0838 /CH0483 (SB0416/CH0482) Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services Delegate Hill 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0961 (SB0511) Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 /CH0006 (HB0739) Task Force to Study Maternal Mental Health Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Finance
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 (HB0009/CH0393) Maryland Home Birth Safety Act Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0158 Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound Options Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0173 (HB0338) Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0187 /CH0329 Workgroup to Study Access to Obstetric Services Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 (HB0220) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0416 /CH0482 (HB0838/CH0483) Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0431 (HB0355) Public Health - Dental Services for Adults - Coverage and Access Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 (HB0961) Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 /CH0363 Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0585 (HB0553) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM