Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pretrial Detention or Release

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049 /CH0041 (SB0068)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Pretrial Risk Scoring Instruments
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 (SB0679)
Title
Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 (SB0273)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622
Title
Correctional Services - Correctional Officers - Minimum Age Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
Criminal Procedure - Automatic Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1377 (SB0513)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408 (SB0929)
Title
Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035
Title
Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 (HB0049/CH0041)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Pretrial Risk Scoring Instruments
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 (HB0356)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB1377)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679 (HB0082)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reimbursement of Special Condition Costs
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811
Title
Criminal Procedure – Maryland Judiciary Case Search – Case Blocking
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 (HB1408)
Title
Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 /CH0041 (SB0068) Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Pretrial Risk Scoring Instruments Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 41
Judiciary
1/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0082 (SB0679) Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements Delegate Moon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0356 (SB0273) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0622 Correctional Services - Correctional Officers - Minimum Age Requirement Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1197 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act) Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act) Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB1335 Criminal Procedure - Automatic Expungement Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1377 (SB0513) Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1408 (SB0929) Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0035 Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020) Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0068 (HB0049/CH0041) Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Pretrial Risk Scoring Instruments Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0273 (HB0356) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0513 (HB1377) Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0679 (HB0082) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reimbursement of Special Condition Costs Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0811 Criminal Procedure – Maryland Judiciary Case Search – Case Blocking Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0929 (HB1408) Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program Senator Hayes 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:29 PM