Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Private Detectives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877 /CH0191 (SB0023/CH0190)
Title
Handgun Permits - Alternative Expiration Date - Private Detectives, Security Guards, and Special Police Officers
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1522 /CH0585
Title
Needs Assessment for Student School-Based Behavioral Health Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 /CH0190 (HB0877/CH0191)
Title
Handgun Permits - Alternative Expiration Date - Private Detectives, Security Guards, and Special Police Officers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235 /CH0230 (HB0470)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Declaration of Legislative Intent - Services
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0877 /CH0191 (SB0023/CH0190) Handgun Permits - Alternative Expiration Date - Private Detectives, Security Guards, and Special Police Officers Delegate McComas 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1522 /CH0585 Needs Assessment for Student School-Based Behavioral Health Services Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Ways and Means
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 /CH0190 (HB0877/CH0191) Handgun Permits - Alternative Expiration Date - Private Detectives, Security Guards, and Special Police Officers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0235 /CH0230 (HB0470) Sales and Use Tax - Declaration of Legislative Intent - Services Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM