Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Privatization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0327 (SB0385/CH0250)
Title
State Government - Health, Education, and Social Services - Submission of Documents in Electronic Form
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Privatization of the Intercounty Connector and the I-95 Express Toll Lanes
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761
Title
State Highway Administration - Privatization of Rest Areas and Welcome Centers on State Highways
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018 (SB0793)
Title
Task Force to Study the Use of Private Diversion Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1287
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Appeals Jurisdiction and Time Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 /CH0418
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Former Officials and Employees - Employment
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385 /CH0250 (HB0327)
Title
State Government - Health, Education, and Social Services - Submission of Documents in Electronic Form
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0560/CH0005)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 (HB1018)
Title
Task Force to Study the Use of Private Diversion Programs
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0327 (SB0385/CH0250) State Government - Health, Education, and Social Services - Submission of Documents in Electronic Form Delegate Ready 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538) Public-Private Partnerships Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 Public-Private Partnerships Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
Appropriations
HB0760 Maryland Transportation Authority - Privatization of the Intercounty Connector and the I-95 Express Toll Lanes Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0761 State Highway Administration - Privatization of Rest Areas and Welcome Centers on State Highways Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1018 (SB0793) Task Force to Study the Use of Private Diversion Programs Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1287 Public-Private Partnerships - Appeals Jurisdiction and Time Requirements Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1429 /CH0418 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Former Officials and Employees - Employment Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0385 /CH0250 (HB0327) State Government - Health, Education, and Social Services - Submission of Documents in Electronic Form Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0538 (HB0560/CH0005) Public-Private Partnerships President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0793 (HB1018) Task Force to Study the Use of Private Diversion Programs Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SJ0005 Public-Private Partnerships Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM