Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Privatization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326 (SB0754)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523
Title
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1326)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0885
Title
State Pension System - Concessionaires and Other Private Entities - Participation
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1326 (SB0754) Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/10/2014 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
SB0523 Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0754 (HB1326) Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Senator Reilly 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0885 State Pension System - Concessionaires and Other Private Entities - Participation Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM