Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Privileged Communications

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008
Title
Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770 (SB0573/CH0367)
Title
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 /CH0457 (SB0049)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Examination of Applicants, Licensees, Certificate Holders, and Trainees
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 (HB0805/CH0457)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Examination of Applicants, Licensees, Certificate Holders, and Trainees
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 /CH0367 (HB0770)
Title
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0596 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0770 (SB0573/CH0367) Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture Requirements Delegate Davis 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 /CH0457 (SB0049) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Examination of Applicants, Licensees, Certificate Holders, and Trainees Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1077 Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0049 (HB0805/CH0457) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Examination of Applicants, Licensees, Certificate Holders, and Trainees Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0573 /CH0367 (HB0770) Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture Requirements Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM