Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Program Open Space

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331 /CH0100
Title
Program Open Space - Funding for Capital Improvements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 /CH0010 (SB0383)
Title
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 (SB0263)
Title
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forest and State Park Land
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1464 (SB0927)
Title
Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 (HB1409)
Title
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forests, State Parks, and Wildlife Management Areas
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0927 (HB1464)
Title
Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0331 /CH0100 Program Open Space - Funding for Capital Improvements Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0376 Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0462 /CH0010 (SB0383) Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 (SB0263) Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forest and State Park Land Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1464 (SB0927) Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016 Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0263 (HB1409) Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forests, State Parks, and Wildlife Management Areas Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0927 (HB1464) Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016 Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page