Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prostitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916 /CH0651 (SB0791)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943
Title
Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping and Prostitution - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188 (SB0215)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 (HB1188)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0654
Title
Criminal Law - Safe Harbor for Minors Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB0916/CH0651)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0916 /CH0651 (SB0791) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0943 Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping and Prostitution - Penalty Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1188 (SB0215) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 (HB1188) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21 Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0654 Criminal Law - Safe Harbor for Minors Act of 2013 Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB0916/CH0651) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM