Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prostitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 (SB0270)
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701 /CH0420 (SB0454/CH0168)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 (SB0674)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 (HB0358)
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 /CH0168 (HB0701/CH0420)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 (HB0858)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002
Title
Acknowledgment of the Sufferings of Sexually Enslaved Women ("Comfort Women") During World War II
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0007
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0358 (SB0270) Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0696 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0701 /CH0420 (SB0454/CH0168) Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - Penalty Delegate Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0858 (SB0674) Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0078 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21 Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 (HB0358) Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0454 /CH0168 (HB0701/CH0420) Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - Penalty Senator Robey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0674 (HB0858) Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0002 Acknowledgment of the Sufferings of Sexually Enslaved Women ("Comfort Women") During World War II Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0007 Human Trafficking Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM