Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prostitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 (SB0881)
Title
Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1494 (SB0964)
Title
Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1276)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1494)
Title
Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1276 (SB0881) Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1494 (SB0964) Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot Program Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1276) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0964 (HB1494) Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and Reports Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM