Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Protection Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044
Title
Family Law - Temporary and Final Protective Orders - Emergency Evaluation for Mental Disorder
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060
Title
Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0282
Title
Family Law - Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Shielding
Sponsor
Delegate Costa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307 /CH0112 (SB0333/CH0111)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 /CH0114 (SB0334/CH0113)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333 (SB0028)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB0369/CH0159)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Penalties - Second or Subsequent Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397 /CH0227
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Consent Orders - Shielding
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 /CH0196 (SB0803/CH0195)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647 (SB0434/CH0164)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Extensions
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 (SB0041)
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221
Title
Discovery - Disclosures Regarding Anonymous Internet Communications
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1278
Title
Family Law - Protective Order Proceedings - Jurisdiction - Custody of Minor Child
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 (HB0333)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 (HB0775)
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333 /CH0111 (HB0307/CH0112)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 /CH0113 (HB0309/CH0114)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0369 /CH0159 (HB0352)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Penalties - Second or Subsequent Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0434 /CH0164 (HB0647)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Extensions
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803 /CH0195 (HB0641/CH0196)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0044 Family Law - Temporary and Final Protective Orders - Emergency Evaluation for Mental Disorder Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0060 Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013 Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0282 Family Law - Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Shielding Delegate Costa 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0307 /CH0112 (SB0333/CH0111) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0309 /CH0114 (SB0334/CH0113) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0333 (SB0028) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 (SB0369/CH0159) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Penalties - Second or Subsequent Offenses Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0397 /CH0227 Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Consent Orders - Shielding Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0641 /CH0196 (SB0803/CH0195) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0647 (SB0434/CH0164) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Extensions Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0775 (SB0041) Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1182 Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief Delegate Glass 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 - 3:30 PM
HB1221 Discovery - Disclosures Regarding Anonymous Internet Communications Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1278 Family Law - Protective Order Proceedings - Jurisdiction - Custody of Minor Child Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 (HB0333) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 (HB0775) Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief Senator Shank 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0333 /CH0111 (HB0307/CH0112) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof Senator Frosh 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 /CH0113 (HB0309/CH0114) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0369 /CH0159 (HB0352) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Penalties - Second or Subsequent Offenses Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0434 /CH0164 (HB0647) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Extensions Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0803 /CH0195 (HB0641/CH0196) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM