Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Protection Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0293 /CH0490 (SB0274)
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428 (SB0574)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498 /CH0657 (SB0562)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827
Title
Public Safety - Secretary of State Police - Temporary Firearms Training Waiver
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0293/CH0490)
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0498/CH0657)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 (HB0428)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0293 /CH0490 (SB0274) Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Judiciary
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0428 (SB0574) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0498 /CH0657 (SB0562) Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 Public Safety - Secretary of State Police - Temporary Firearms Training Waiver Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1057 Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0293/CH0490) Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0562 (HB0498/CH0657) Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals Senator Kelley 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0574 (HB0428) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM