Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Psychiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839
Title
Public Health - State Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANS
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB1028/CH0685)
Title
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0786
Title
State Government - Veteran Employment and Transition Success Program
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder Screenings
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 /CH0250
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1359
Title
Criminal Procedure - Mental Health and Substance Abuse Offender Reentry Support Program
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1628
Title
Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1652 (SB0704/CH0691)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1720
Title
Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspension and Expulsion and Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0704 /CH0691 (HB1652)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1028 /CH0685 (HB0902)
Title
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1263
Title
Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0839 Public Health - State Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANS Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0902 (SB1028/CH0685) Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act) Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report Adopted
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0786 State Government - Veteran Employment and Transition Success Program Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 786
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1289 Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder Screenings Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 /CH0250 Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
HB1359 Criminal Procedure - Mental Health and Substance Abuse Offender Reentry Support Program Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1628 Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1652 (SB0704/CH0691) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1720 Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspension and Expulsion and Policies Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0704 /CH0691 (HB1652) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 691
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1028 /CH0685 (HB0902) Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act) Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1263 Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM