Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Psychologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091
Title
Health Occupations - Sexual Orientation Change Efforts - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0113 (SB0225/CH0147)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395 (SB0702)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 /CH0196 (SB0803/CH0195)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 /CH0353 (SB0882/CH0352)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 (SB0807)
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing Education
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0225 /CH0147 (HB0113)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - Registration
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB0395)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803 /CH0195 (HB0641/CH0196)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0807 (HB1339)
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882 /CH0352 (HB1267/CH0353)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0091 Health Occupations - Sexual Orientation Change Efforts - Prohibited Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0113 (SB0225/CH0147) State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - Registration Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0395 (SB0702) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0641 /CH0196 (SB0803/CH0195) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1267 /CH0353 (SB0882/CH0352) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1339 (SB0807) Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and Reporting Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1404 Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing Education Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0225 /CH0147 (HB0113) State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - Registration Senator Montgomery 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 (HB0395) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0803 /CH0195 (HB0641/CH0196) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0807 (HB1339) Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and Reporting Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0882 /CH0352 (HB1267/CH0353) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM