Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Psychologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 /CH0437 (SB0198)
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 (SB0157/CH0327)
Title
Consultation, Diagnosis, and Treatment of Mental and Emotional Disorders - Consent by Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862 /CH0485 (SB0743/CH0484)
Title
Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908 (SB0617)
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 (SB0676)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1116
Title
Public Schools - Student Suicide Intervention - Required Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1214
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of Damages
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157 /CH0327 (HB0662)
Title
Consultation, Diagnosis, and Treatment of Mental and Emotional Disorders - Consent by Minors
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 (HB0580/CH0437)
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 (HB0908)
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB1021)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0484 (HB0862/CH0485)
Title
Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0547 Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0580 /CH0437 (SB0198) Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0662 (SB0157/CH0327) Consultation, Diagnosis, and Treatment of Mental and Emotional Disorders - Consent by Minors Delegate Cullison 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0862 /CH0485 (SB0743/CH0484) Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0908 (SB0617) Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 (SB0676) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1116 Public Schools - Student Suicide Intervention - Required Procedures Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1214 Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of Damages Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0157 /CH0327 (HB0662) Consultation, Diagnosis, and Treatment of Mental and Emotional Disorders - Consent by Minors Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0198 (HB0580/CH0437) Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0617 (HB0908) Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 (HB1021) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 /CH0484 (HB0862/CH0485) Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 484
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM