Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Psychologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB1106/CH0610)
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 (SB0354)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of Damages
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912 /CH0769
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Criminal History Records Checks - Renewals and Reinstatements
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 (SB0664/CH0690)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Meetings and Timeliness of Certification and Licensure Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0370)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 /CH0690 (HB0981)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1106 /CH0610 (HB0352)
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0352 (SB1106/CH0610) Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy Delegate Reznik 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0370 (SB0354) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0641 Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of Damages Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0912 /CH0769 State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Criminal History Records Checks - Renewals and Reinstatements Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 769
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0981 (SB0664/CH0690) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1060 State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Meetings and Timeliness of Certification and Licensure Issuance Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 (HB0370) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0664 /CH0690 (HB0981) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 690
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1106 /CH0610 (HB0352) Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM