Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Psychologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190 /CH0671
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB1028/CH0685)
Title
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0786
Title
State Government - Veteran Employment and Transition Success Program
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder Screenings
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 /CH0250
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1359
Title
Criminal Procedure - Mental Health and Substance Abuse Offender Reentry Support Program
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1628
Title
Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1720
Title
Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspension and Expulsion and Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 /CH0757 (HB0742/CH0756)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1028 /CH0685 (HB0902)
Title
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1263
Title
Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0190 /CH0671 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and Evaluation Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0902 (SB1028/CH0685) Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act) Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report Adopted
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0786 State Government - Veteran Employment and Transition Success Program Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 786
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1289 Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder Screenings Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 /CH0250 Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
HB1359 Criminal Procedure - Mental Health and Substance Abuse Offender Reentry Support Program Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1628 Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1720 Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspension and Expulsion and Policies Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0552 /CH0757 (HB0742/CH0756) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 757
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1028 /CH0685 (HB0902) Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act) Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1263 Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM