Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0364 (SB0310)
Title
CyberMaryland Act of 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939
Title
Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295 /CH0584 (SB0989/CH0583)
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1516 (SB1002)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1542 /CH0795
Title
Department of Commerce – Employment in the State’s Defense Industry – Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1641
Title
Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1698
Title
Education - Life Changing Experiences School Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0578
Title
Cybersecurity Incentive Tax Credits
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287
Title
State Funds - Procurement of Services From Internet Service Providers - Restriction
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 (HB0364)
Title
CyberMaryland Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0502 /CH0393 (HB0871/CH0392)
Title
University System of Maryland – Board of Regents and Quasi–Endowment Funds
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0989 /CH0583 (HB1295/CH0584)
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1002 (HB1516)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0364 (SB0310) CyberMaryland Act of 2018 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1295 /CH0584 (SB0989/CH0583) One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration Delegate Buckel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Ways and Means
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1516 (SB1002) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018) Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1542 /CH0795 Department of Commerce – Employment in the State’s Defense Industry – Study Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 795
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1641 Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
HB1698 Education - Life Changing Experiences School Program - Established Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0228 /CH0578 Cybersecurity Incentive Tax Credits Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 578
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0287 State Funds - Procurement of Services From Internet Service Providers - Restriction Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0310 (HB0364) CyberMaryland Act of 2018 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0502 /CH0393 (HB0871/CH0392) University System of Maryland – Board of Regents and Quasi–Endowment Funds Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0989 /CH0583 (HB1295/CH0584) One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1002 (HB1516) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018) Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM