Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343 (SB0270)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0421 /CH0202 (SB0363/CH0203)
Title
State Government – Open Meetings – Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 (SB0398)
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0521 /CH0231 (SB0583/CH0232)
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 (SB0369)
Title
Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1002 (SB0308)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Chief Executive Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239 (SB0602)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Partnership Program
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426 (SB0739)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1455 (SB0826)
Title
Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013 (HB0056/CH0611)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 (HB0343)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0308 (HB1002)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Chief Executive Officer
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363 /CH0203 (HB0421/CH0202)
Title
State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0369 (HB0804)
Title
Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 (HB0514)
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 /CH0232 (HB0521/CH0231)
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 (HB1239)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Partnership Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0739 (HB1426)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 /CH0580
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Revision
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 (HB1455)
Title
Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980
Title
Industrial Partnerships - Sustainable Materials Management Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1049
Title
Cybersecurity Talent Pipeline Management Program
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1060
Title
Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology Transfer
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0343 (SB0270) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0421 /CH0202 (SB0363/CH0203) State Government – Open Meetings – Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 202
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0514 (SB0398) Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program Delegate Qi 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0521 /CH0231 (SB0583/CH0232) Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment Delegate Qi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 231
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0804 (SB0369) Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1002 (SB0308) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Chief Executive Officer Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Ways and Means
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1239 (SB0602) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Partnership Program Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 (SB0739) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1455 (SB0826) Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
SB0013 (HB0056/CH0611) Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0270 (HB0343) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0308 (HB1002) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Chief Executive Officer Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
SB0363 /CH0203 (HB0421/CH0202) State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0369 (HB0804) Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0398 (HB0514) Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0583 /CH0232 (HB0521/CH0231) Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 232
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0602 (HB1239) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Partnership Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0739 (HB1426) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0747 /CH0580 Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Revision President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0826 (HB1455) Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0980 Industrial Partnerships - Sustainable Materials Management Program - Established Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
SB1049 Cybersecurity Talent Pipeline Management Program Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1060 Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology Transfer Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:25 PM