Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0006 (SB0080)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 (SB0460)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0577)
Title
Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 (SB0330)
Title
State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0709)
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987
Title
Economic Development – Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065
Title
Bond Authority – Maryland State Ceiling and Housing Bond Allocations
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 (SB0802)
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Innovation Initiative University Expansion Pilot Program – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Technology Development Corporation – Pre–Seed Builder Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 (HB0006)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 (HB0469)
Title
State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 (HB0419)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612)
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0577 (HB0443)
Title
Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0639
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation – Inclusion Fund – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB0892)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 (HB1169)
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Innovation Initiative University Expansion Pilot Program – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902
Title
Economic Development - Cyber Workforce Program and Fund - Established
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0006 (SB0080) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Ways and Means
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0419 (SB0460) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (92-39)
Economic Matters
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0443 (SB0577) Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0469 (SB0330) State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0654 Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0892 (SB0709) Economic Development – Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program – Establishment Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0987 Economic Development – Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program – Establishment Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1065 Bond Authority – Maryland State Ceiling and Housing Bond Allocations Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1169 (SB0802) Economic Development – Maryland Innovation Initiative University Expansion Pilot Program – Establishment Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1211 Economic Development – Maryland Technology Development Corporation – Pre–Seed Builder Fund Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0080 (HB0006) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0330 (HB0469) State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0460 (HB0419) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612) Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0577 (HB0443) Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0639 Maryland Technology Development Corporation – Inclusion Fund – Establishment Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0709 (HB0892) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program - Establishment Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0802 (HB1169) Economic Development – Maryland Innovation Initiative University Expansion Pilot Program – Establishment Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0902 Economic Development - Cyber Workforce Program and Fund - Established Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 1:24 PM
Click to return on the top page