Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Public Debt -see also- County & Balt City Bonds; State Bonds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525 (SB0516/CH0283)
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0819
Title
Prudent Pension Management Act
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 /CH0283 (HB0525)
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 (HB0860/CH0647)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002
Title
U.S. Constitution - Article V Amendments Convention - State Approval of Federal Debt Increases
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0525 (SB0516/CH0283) Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0605 Public-Private Partnerships Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
Appropriations
HB0819 Prudent Pension Management Act Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0516 /CH0283 (HB0525) Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 (HB0860/CH0647) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SJ0002 U.S. Constitution - Article V Amendments Convention - State Approval of Federal Debt Increases Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page