Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Local Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183 (SB0330/CH0159)
Title
Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - Legalization
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 /CH0082
Title
Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0193
Title
Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 /CH0159 (HB0183)
Title
Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0183 (SB0330/CH0159) Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - Legalization Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0284 /CH0082 Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary Delegate Flanagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0193 Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary Senator Bates 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0330 /CH0159 (HB0183) Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - Legalization Senator Klausmeier 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM