Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200 /CH0407 (SB0189)
Title
State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 (SB0414)
Title
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622 (SB0603)
Title
Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Conditional Parole
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0694 /CH0268 (SB0286)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980 (SB0340)
Title
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1237 /CH0305
Title
Police and Correctional Training Commissions - Applicants - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189 (HB0200/CH0407)
Title
State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0286 (HB0694/CH0268)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340 (HB0980)
Title
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0301)
Title
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603 (HB0622)
Title
Correctional Services - Aging Prisoners - Conditional Parole
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912
Title
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0200 /CH0407 (SB0189) State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination Delegate Cluster 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Judiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0301 (SB0414) Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0622 (SB0603) Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Conditional Parole Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0694 /CH0268 (SB0286) Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - Membership Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
HB0980 (SB0340) Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons Delegate McCray 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 6 of 2016
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1237 /CH0305 Police and Correctional Training Commissions - Applicants - Criminal History Records Checks Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0189 (HB0200/CH0407) State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0286 (HB0694/CH0268) Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - Membership Senator Manno 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0340 (HB0980) Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons Senator Conway 2 2 Vote on Veto Special Ordered until 4/8/2016
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 (HB0301) Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0603 (HB0622) Correctional Services - Aging Prisoners - Conditional Parole Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM