Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Works

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074
Title
State Development Plan - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103
Title
Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General Assembly
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207 /CH0589
Title
State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building Council
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 /CH0098
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Review of Capital Projects - Duties of Director
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545 (SB0555/CH0063)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615 /CH0415
Title
Coast Smart Council
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0634 (SB0185)
Title
Transportation - Capital Projects - Life-Cycle Cost Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 /CH0282 (SB0232/CH0281)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0951 /CH0625 (SB0774)
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate McHale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 (SB0705)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Capitol Heights Public Works Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0168/CH0043)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326 (SB0754)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427
Title
Task Force to Study Expanding Metrorail Service in Southern Prince George's County
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0055
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - City of Seat Pleasant Public Works Facility
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0274
Title
Department of Transportation - Special Bonds and Borrowing - Revenue-Backed Bonds
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 /CH0043 (HB1184)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 (HB0634)
Title
Transportation - Capital Projects - Life-Cycle Cost Analysis
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232 /CH0281 (HB0727/CH0282)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 /CH0063 (HB0545)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB1113)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Capitol Heights Public Works Facility
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1326)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 (HB0951/CH0625)
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 State Development Plan - Repeal Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0103 Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General Assembly Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0207 /CH0589 State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building Council Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0346 /CH0098 Maryland Historical Trust - Review of Capital Projects - Duties of Director Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0545 (SB0555/CH0063) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0615 /CH0415 Coast Smart Council Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0634 (SB0185) Transportation - Capital Projects - Life-Cycle Cost Analysis Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0727 /CH0282 (SB0232/CH0281) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Delegate Olszewski 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0951 /CH0625 (SB0774) Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements Delegate McHale 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 (SB0705) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Capitol Heights Public Works Facility Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 12:00 PM
HB1184 (SB0168/CH0043) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB1326 (SB0754) Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/10/2014 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB1427 Task Force to Study Expanding Metrorail Service in Southern Prince George's County Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0055 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - City of Seat Pleasant Public Works Facility Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0088 /CH0274 Department of Transportation - Special Bonds and Borrowing - Revenue-Backed Bonds Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0168 /CH0043 (HB1184) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0185 (HB0634) Transportation - Capital Projects - Life-Cycle Cost Analysis Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0204 Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014 Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0232 /CH0281 (HB0727/CH0282) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0555 /CH0063 (HB0545) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 (HB1113) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Capitol Heights Public Works Facility Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 3:00 PM
SB0754 (HB1326) Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 (HB0951/CH0625) Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM