Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Works

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 /CH0435 (SB0323)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Rates MC/PG 101-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358
Title
Baltimore City - Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Service Charges - Qualified Residential Customers
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 (SB0355/CH0388)
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 (SB0886)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Complete and Green Streets
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 /CH0427 (SB0736)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1049
Title
Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0251/CH0435)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 /CH0388 (HB0414)
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 (HB0892/CH0427)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0886 (HB0833)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Complete and Green Streets
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0251 /CH0435 (SB0323) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Rates MC/PG 101-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0358 Baltimore City - Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Service Charges - Qualified Residential Customers Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0414 (SB0355/CH0388) Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Economic Matters
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0833 (SB0886) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Complete and Green Streets Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 12:00 PM
HB0892 /CH0427 (SB0736) St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1049 Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB0323 (HB0251/CH0435) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 /CH0388 (HB0414) Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Finance
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0736 (HB0892/CH0427) St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds Senator Waugh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0886 (HB0833) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Complete and Green Streets Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM